NY S05079 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a toll-free hotline and a website where motorists can report potholes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a toll-free hotline and a website where motorists can report potholes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading cal.829
2018-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a1992
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1664
2018-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2017-03-07SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A01992 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s5079

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback