NY S05071 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5071A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5071A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing for students in certain postsecondary education experience or transition programs to receive awards from the tuition assistance program.
Title
Relates to allowing for students in certain postsecondary education experience or transition programs to receive awards from the tuition assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5071A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1146 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07236 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education