NY S05069 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 5069D
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 5069D
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs schools to provide information on meningococcal disease immunization to students and parents of students in seventh grade, and requires such schools to maintain record of responses as to whether such students have received such immunization.
Title
Directs schools to provide information on meningococcal disease immunization to students and parents of students in seventh grade, and requires such schools to maintain record of responses as to whether such students have received such immunization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5069D |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5069C |
2012-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1108 |
2011-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5069B |
2011-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5069A |
2011-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08231 (Same As) 2012-06-11 - reported referred to ways and means