NY S05060 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that the council on human blood and transfusion services shall review all current medical research and guidance regarding the donation of blood by patients with a history of Lyme or tick-borne illnesses.
Title
Establishes that the council on human blood and transfusion services shall review all current medical research and guidance regarding the donation of blood by patients with a history of Lyme or tick-borne illnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1347 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |