NY S05059 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the imposition of sales and compensating use taxes in Putnam county.
Title
Relates to the imposition of sales and compensating use taxes in Putnam county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.201 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.552 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7104 |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.809 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07104 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5059