NY S05059 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that qualified persons who have never previously registered to vote may register on any day, including a day of election, that the board of elections is open for business; requires establishment of a procedure to enable such registrants to cast their votes at the appropriate polling places.
Title
Provides that qualified persons who have never previously registered to vote may register on any day, including a day of election, that the board of elections is open for business; requires establishment of a procedure to enable such registrants to cast their votes at the appropriate polling places.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - WITHDRAWN | |
2010-05-06 | PRINT NUMBER 5059A | |
2010-05-06 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | |
2010-05-03 | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A5257 (Same As) 2010-05-11 - print number 5257a