NY S05058 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires multiple liens on farm property to be paid in chronological order, with the earliest lien being paid off first and the most recent being paid last.
Title
Requires multiple liens on farm property to be paid in chronological order, with the earliest lien being paid off first and the most recent being paid last.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-04-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03966 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation