NY S05009 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain lobbyists from engaging in political consulting for state public officials or candidates for state office, and prohibits political consultants or anyone they are affiliated with from lobbying state officers; requires election financial disclosure statements to include a listing of all political consulting services provided to a campaign.
Title
Prohibits certain lobbyists from engaging in political consulting for state public officials or candidates for state office, and prohibits political consultants or anyone they are affiliated with from lobbying state officers; requires election financial disclosure statements to include a listing of all political consulting services provided to a campaign.
Sponsors
Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1031 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5009A |
2013-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07657 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to governmental operations