NY S04955 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-20 - SIGNED CHAP.552
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the state fire prevention and building code council to study and report on the standardization of the state building code, and local building codes; permits processes to facilitate increased use and development of solar and wind energy generating systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the state fire prevention and building code council to study and report on the standardization of the state building code, and local building codes; permits processes to facilitate increased use and development of solar and wind energy generating systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-20 SIGNED CHAP.552
2010-10-08 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-29 returned to senate
2010-06-29 passed assembly
2010-06-29 ordered to third reading rules cal.175
2010-06-29 substituted for a7653c
2010-06-25 referred to governmental operations
2010-06-24 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-24 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-24 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1190
2010-06-24 COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2010-06-21 PRINT NUMBER 4955B
2010-06-21 AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2010-01-06 REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2009-05-12 PRINT NUMBER 4955A
2009-05-12 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2009-04-27 REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A7653-A (Same As) 2010-06-29 - substituted by s4955b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback