NY S04944 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.208
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.208
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits members of the Fair Harbor fire district to adopt a resolution changing the date for the nomination of the chief and assistant chiefs of such fire department.
Title
Permits members of the Fair Harbor fire district to adopt a resolution changing the date for the nomination of the chief and assistant chiefs of such fire department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.208 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.502 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6991a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1321 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4944A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06991 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.208