NY S04880 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6881A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6881A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to committees on preschool special education and the requirement that parents attend meetings of the committee.
Title
Relates to committees on preschool special education and the requirement that parents attend meetings of the committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6881A |
2013-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4880A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.644 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2013-05-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE |
2013-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06881 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.213