NY S04865 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - DEFEATED IN CODES
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - DEFEATED IN CODES
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing witnesses with facility dogs.
Title
Relates to providing witnesses with facility dogs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CODES |
2014-03-10 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-11-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4865A |
2013-11-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2013-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07159 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to codes