NY S04852 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the designation of housing judges as judicial hearing officers.
Title
Relates to the designation of housing judges as judicial hearing officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.744 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |