NY S04833 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a work opportunity tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a work opportunity tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-21SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-03-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 4833B
2024-03-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-04-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-02-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 4833A
2023-02-27SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-02-15SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08905 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - referred to labor

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback