NY S04821 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4821A
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - PRINT NUMBER 4821A
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting drug or alcohol testing and screening of pregnant or postpartum individuals and newborns unless the individual consents and it is within the scope of medical care, or the testing or screening is necessary for a medical emergency.
Title
Relates to prohibiting drug or alcohol testing and screening of pregnant or postpartum individuals and newborns unless the individual consents and it is within the scope of medical care, or the testing or screening is necessary for a medical emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4821A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2021-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A04285 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - ordered to third reading rules cal.446