NY S04809 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to filing of an order imposing against revoked premises a proscription against future licensure.
Title
Relates to filing of an order imposing against revoked premises a proscription against future licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.975 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.941 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05771 (Same As) 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in economic development