NY S04793 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an exemption from the small food processing licensing requirements for pickling.
Title
Relates to an exemption from the small food processing licensing requirements for pickling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |