NY S04792 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the inspection of family court proceedings records when a defendant who is the subject of such record is charged with a sex offense.
Title
Provides for the inspection of family court proceedings records when a defendant who is the subject of such record is charged with a sex offense.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.80 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.763 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07114 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to codes