NY S04768 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.289
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.289
Summary
Enacts the fraternal benefit society risk based capital act of 2009; establishing risk-based capital requirements applicable to fraternal benefit societies.
Title
Enacts the fraternal benefit society risk based capital act of 2009; establishing risk-based capital requirements applicable to fraternal benefit societies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | SIGNED CHAP.289 | |
2009-07-17 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-06-16 | returned to senate | |
2009-06-16 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.355 | |
2009-06-16 | substituted for a8463 | |
2009-05-26 | referred to insurance | |
2009-05-26 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-26 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-12 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-11 | 1ST REPORT CAL.289 | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08463 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.289
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04768&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |