NY S04750 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: No history available
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: No history available
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the exemption from taxation for micro-hydroelectric energy systems, fuel cell electric generating systems, or micro-combined heat and power generating equipment systems.
Title
Relates to the exemption from taxation for micro-hydroelectric energy systems, fuel cell electric generating systems, or micro-combined heat and power generating equipment systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4750C |
2016-03-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4750B |
2016-02-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4750A |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01872 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S04750 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -
S04750 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -