NY S04741 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Stephen's law"; requires certified treatment programs to notify patients of their right to name an emergency contact.
Title
Enacts "Stephen's law"; requires certified treatment programs to notify patients of their right to name an emergency contact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.270 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.249 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a9536 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.330 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4741B |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2019-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.510 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4741A |
2019-04-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |