NY S04699 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authorization for Ontario county to impose additional rates of sales and compensating use taxes until 2015.
Title
Relates to extending the authorization for Ontario county to impose additional rates of sales and compensating use taxes until 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5035 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.883 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05035 (Same As) 2013-08-19 - signed chap.310