NY S04682 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-06 - SIGNED CHAP.421
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in work zones by means of photo devices; relates to notices of liability and the adjudication of certain traffic infractions involving the use of photo monitoring devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in work zones by means of photo devices; relates to notices of liability and the adjudication of certain traffic infractions involving the use of photo monitoring devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-06AssemblySIGNED CHAP.421
2021-09-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.408
2021-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a485b
2021-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-01SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4682B
2021-04-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-04-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-04-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.765
2021-04-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 4682A
2021-04-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2021-02-08SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A00485 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s4682b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4682
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04682&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04682
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04682&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04682A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04682&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04682B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4682#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4682#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04682&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback