NY S04667 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide presumptive eligibility standard where upon application for child care assistance, with included documentation required by a local social services district, a family shall be presumed eligible for such assistance for a period of thirty to sixty days.
Title
Establishes a statewide presumptive eligibility standard where upon application for child care assistance, with included documentation required by a local social services district, a family shall be presumed eligible for such assistance for a period of thirty to sixty days.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.146 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2023-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04099 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to children and families