NY S04623 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption for tangible personal property and services sold by a cemetery; establishes an amnesty program for cemetery corporations.
Title
Provides an exemption for tangible personal property and services sold by a cemetery; establishes an amnesty program for cemetery corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1833 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4623A |
2018-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2158 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07647 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - print number 7647a