NY S04619 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4619A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4619A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the registration and regulation of animal breeders; requires each to be licensed; creates a breeder licensing fund; exempts not-for-profit organizations.
Title
Relates to the registration and regulation of animal breeders; requires each to be licensed; creates a breeder licensing fund; exempts not-for-profit organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4619A |
2016-01-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2015-04-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03537 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - print number 3537a