NY S04619 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reduction of mercury in mercury-added lamps.
Title
Relates to the reduction of mercury in mercury-added lamps.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-12-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4619A |
2011-12-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05583 (Same As) 2012-06-11 - reported referred to rules