NY S04611 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a clinical preceptorship personal income tax credit for certain health care professionals who provide preceptor instruction to students studying to be a health care professional.
Title
Establishes a clinical preceptorship personal income tax credit for certain health care professionals who provide preceptor instruction to students studying to be a health care professional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4611B |
2018-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1054 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4611A |
2017-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06820 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - print number 6820b