NY S04578 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to service of papers; amends the definition of "mailing" to allow mailing from outside of the state; provides that six days shall be added to a prescribed period when service is made by mail from outside the state; requires a stipulation prior to service by facsimile on an attorney.
Title
Relates to service of papers; amends the definition of "mailing" to allow mailing from outside of the state; provides that six days shall be added to a prescribed period when service is made by mail from outside the state; requires a stipulation prior to service by facsimile on an attorney.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.624 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.442 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06835 (Same As) 2012-02-13 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY