NY S04568 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10511
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10511
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the requirement for the service of the commander of the Air National Guard.
Title
Amends the requirement for the service of the commander of the Air National Guard.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10511 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1353 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.866 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A10511 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.175