NY S04558 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to registered dental assisting; increases the age for registered dental assisting from seventeen to eighteen years of age.
Title
Relates to registered dental assisting; increases the age for registered dental assisting from seventeen to eighteen years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.390 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.828 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4558 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-05-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.291 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-31 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4064 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.828 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04064 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.390