NY S04519 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5823B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5823B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice to adjoining owners of construction or demolition work at the time such application for approval is submitted.
Title
Requires notice to adjoining owners of construction or demolition work at the time such application for approval is submitted.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5823B |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1555 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4519A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1247 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05823 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.217