NY S04518 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to orders of custody involving a parent deployed to military service, permits only temporary orders which shall expire within ten days of the end of the deployment.
Title
Relates to orders of custody involving a parent deployed to military service, permits only temporary orders which shall expire within ten days of the end of the deployment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.386 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.623 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |