NY S04466 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the expiration date of the personal income tax surcharge imposed by the city of Yonkers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the expiration date of the personal income tax surcharge imposed by the city of Yonkers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03Senatesigned chap.62
2019-06-28Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14AssemblyPASSED SENATE
2019-06-14AssemblyHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-14Assembly3RD READING CAL.1214
2019-06-14AssemblySUBSTITUTED FOR S4466
2019-05-20AssemblyREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-20Senatedelivered to senate
2019-05-20Senatepassed assembly
2019-05-20Senatehome rule request
2019-05-16Senateadvanced to third reading cal.356
2019-05-14Senatereported
2019-03-15Senatereferred to ways and means
2019-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6694
2019-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1214
2019-06-06SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-26SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-03-12SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06694 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.62

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback