NY S04465 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Title
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03896 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means