NY S04452 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - PRINT NUMBER 4452B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes funds in the case of certain tax certiorari challenges or agreed upon settlements; authorizes the board of education to establish a tax certiorari stabilization reserve fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes funds in the case of certain tax certiorari challenges or agreed upon settlements; authorizes the board of education to establish a tax certiorari stabilization reserve fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 4452B
2020-06-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2019-04-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 4452A
2019-04-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07243 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback