NY S04448 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes permanent certain provisions relating to citizenship requirements for permanent certification as a teacher.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes permanent certain provisions relating to citizenship requirements for permanent certification as a teacher.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.422
2019-10-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.488
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a2100
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to education
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1313
2019-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A02100 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s4448

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback