NY S04413 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes age sixteen as the minimum age for assisting in the conduct of any game of bingo.
Title
Establishes age sixteen as the minimum age for assisting in the conduct of any game of bingo.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.273 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.122 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a3939 |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2016-04-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.235 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2015-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A03939 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s4413