NY S04413 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Commitment to Military Education Act" to provide tuition assistance to members of the armed forces who were enrolled in a tuition assistance program cancelled or suspended.
Title
Enacts the "Commitment to Military Education Act" to provide tuition assistance to members of the armed forces who were enrolled in a tuition assistance program cancelled or suspended.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A06443 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to higher education