NY S04349 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the public service commission to implement rules requiring public utility companies to remove or relocate their utility poles when necessary for road improvements.
Title
Directs the public service commission to implement rules requiring public utility companies to remove or relocate their utility poles when necessary for road improvements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.777 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |