NY S04342 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain offenders convicted of certain homicide, hate, terrorism and major drug trafficking crimes ineligible for merit, presumptive release and limited credit time.
Title
Makes certain offenders convicted of certain homicide, hate, terrorism and major drug trafficking crimes ineligible for merit, presumptive release and limited credit time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2013-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.392 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |