NY S04342 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4342A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 4342A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of agriculture and markets to inspect the condition of certain horse stalls in cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Directs the department of agriculture and markets to inspect the condition of certain horse stalls in cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4342A |
2012-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2011-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03317 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - print number 3317a