NY S04338 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2370B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2370B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Dutchess to regulate the registration and licensing of taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.
Title
Authorizes the county of Dutchess to regulate the registration and licensing of taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2370B |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.395 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4338A |
2016-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.613 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02370 (Same As) 2016-08-31 - signed chap.287