NY S04338 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain municipal legislative bodies, including towns and villages, to enact local laws and ordinances providing for non-binding mediation of land use decisions.
Title
Authorizes certain municipal legislative bodies, including towns and villages, to enact local laws and ordinances providing for non-binding mediation of land use decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.544 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.426 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01265 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to judiciary