NY S04278 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of the term "cremation".
Title
Relates to the definition of the term "cremation".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03740 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - enacting clause stricken
A10006 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
A10006 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions