NY S04265 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of ingredients in personal care products and cosmetics to include restricted substances which shall be provided on lists identified by the commissioner.
Title
Provides for the regulation of ingredients in personal care products and cosmetics to include restricted substances which shall be provided on lists identified by the commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.509 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06969 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means