NY S04229 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Suffolk county to sell certain delinquent tax liens on brownfield property to private buyers.
Title
Authorizes Suffolk county to sell certain delinquent tax liens on brownfield property to private buyers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.554 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2011-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.636 |
2011-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05554 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to ways and means