NY S04228 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of "I Support Music Education" distinctive plates to benefit the NY summer school for the arts.
Title
Authorizes the issuance of "I Support Music Education" distinctive plates to benefit the NY summer school for the arts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4228A |
2019-03-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04159 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in transportation