NY S04222 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A627
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes aggravated harassment, sexual misconduct, forcible touching, sexual abuse, stalking, criminal mischief, criminal obstruction of breathing or blood circulation, and strangulation within the criminal offenses which may constitute domestic violence for the purposes of domestic violence prevention; and includes unrelated persons in an "intimate relationship" within the definition of "family or household members" for purposes of domestic violence prevention.
Title
Includes aggravated harassment, sexual misconduct, forcible touching, sexual abuse, stalking, criminal mischief, criminal obstruction of breathing or blood circulation, and strangulation within the criminal offenses which may constitute domestic violence for the purposes of domestic violence prevention; and includes unrelated persons in an "intimate relationship" within the definition of "family or household members" for purposes of domestic violence prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Saland [R] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Daniel Squadron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A627 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.291 |
2011-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A00627 (Same As) 2011-04-13 - signed chap.11