NY S04201 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public employers from taking retaliatory adverse personnel actions against employees who use sick leave or compensatory time to quarantine, seek medical treatment, or for other absences related to COVID-19.
Title
Prohibits public employers from taking retaliatory adverse personnel actions against employees who use sick leave or compensatory time to quarantine, seek medical treatment, or for other absences related to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.214 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.217 |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | substituted for a4063a |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-03-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.510 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4201A |
2021-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04063 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - substituted by s4201a